IN HB1139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various election law matters. Provides that the procedure for removing election inspectors and judges also applies to poll clerks, assistant poll clerks, and election sheriffs. Exempts certain statutorily protected residence addresses from the requirement to publish the address of each primary election candidate. Makes technical changes relating to: (1) filing statements of economic interests; (2) updating voter registration information; (3) transmitting absentee ballots; (4) appointment of absentee voter boards; (5) filling candidate vacancies; (6) transmission of voter registration applications; (7) public questions; and (8) certification of special election results. Updates dates and other references in the election law. Removes other
Title
Various election law matters. Provides that the procedure for removing election inspectors and judges also applies to poll clerks, assistant poll clerks, and election sheriffs. Exempts certain statutorily protected residence addresses from the requirement to publish the address of each primary election candidate. Makes technical changes relating to: (1) filing statements of economic interests; (2) updating voter registration information; (3) transmitting absentee ballots; (4) appointment of absentee voter boards; (5) filling candidate vacancies; (6) transmission of voter registration applications; (7) public questions; and (8) certification of special election results. Updates dates and other references in the election law. Removes other
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Public Law 216 |
2015-05-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 537: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 562: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Pete and Taylor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Walker and Lanane |
2015-04-22 | House | House Advisors appointed: Smith M, Nisly, Kersey and GiaQuinta |
2015-04-22 | House | House Conferees appointed: Richardson and Bartlett |
2015-04-21 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Elections |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Miller, Pete added as second sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Walker added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2015-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Richardson |