IN HB1147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal elections. Authorizes the legislative body of a town or of a city (if the city has a population of less than 3,500) to adopt an ordinance to move the election of all elected offices of the municipality to even-numbered years.
Title
Municipal elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] | Rep. Chris May [R] |
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 107 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second sponsor |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 42, nays 6 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 93, nays 5 |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative May added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | House | Representative Pfaff added as coauthor |
2020-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2020-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative Wesco |
2020-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Morrison |