IN HB1180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
EMT use of injectable epinephrine. Requires the emergency medical services commission to establish training and certification standards for the administration of epinephrine through a prefilled syringe and a syringe and ampule by an emergency medical technician (EMT). Allows an EMT who has been certified to administer epinephrine through an auto-injector, a prefilled syringe, and a syringe and ampule.
Title
EMT use of injectable epinephrine. Requires the emergency medical services commission to establish training and certification standards for the administration of epinephrine through a prefilled syringe and a syringe and ampule by an emergency medical technician (EMT). Allows an EMT who has been certified to administer epinephrine through an auto-injector, a prefilled syringe, and a syringe and ampule.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 34 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senator Zay added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-18 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman, Charbonneau and Taylor G |
2018-01-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Davisson, Brown T and Hatfield |
2018-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Mahan |