IN HB1189 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an accredited nonpublic school to provide sufficient verbal information to permit a requesting school to which a child transfers to make an appropriate placement decision when the parent of the child is in breach of a contract that conditions release of student records on the payment of outstanding tuition and other fees. Requires the state board of education to conduct a second count of students enrolled in school corporations and charter schools in February of each school year. Expires the school funding formula on July 1, 2013. Transfers the appropriation and funding for charter school start-up grants to the appropriation for state tuition support. Increases the amount of the charter school start-up grant for charter schools that begin operation in calendar year 2012 and provides that the grant is to be paid in six installments with one installment in each of the last six months of calendar year 2012. Specifies that the amount distributed as special grants to school corporations to reflect the savings resulting from the education of students under a choice scholarship rather than in a school corporation are limited only by the state fiscal year appropriation and not the calendar year cap that limits the amount of state tuition support payable in a calendar year.
Title
School finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-10 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 366: yeas 35, nays 15 | |
2012-03-10 | Senate Rule 86(a) suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 412: yeas 52, nays 40 | |
2012-03-09 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-09 | Representative Behning added as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Representative Behning removed as House advisor | |
2012-03-09 | Representative Porter removed as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Kruse added as conferee | |
2012-03-09 | Senator Skinner removed as conferee | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisors appointed: Kenley, Mishler and Rogers | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Charbonneau and Skinner | |
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Clere, Behning, Goodin and Kersey | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Thompson and Porter | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 48 and nays 2 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 2 (Charbonneau), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-27 | Senator Simpson added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-26 | Representatives Clere and Porter added as coauthors | |
2012-01-26 | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Rogers | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 82, nays 14 | |
2012-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Thompson |