IN HB1189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crime reporting requirements. Requires local law enforcement agencies to provide criminal justice data to the Indiana state police. Requires local law enforcement agencies to participate in a statewide uniform crime report program with the National Incident Based Reporting System (NIBRS). Requires the criminal justice data division of the state police department to report crime statistics to the governor semiannually (rather than annually, as required under current law).
Title
Crime reporting requirements. Requires local law enforcement agencies to provide criminal justice data to the Indiana state police. Requires local law enforcement agencies to participate in a statewide uniform crime report program with the National Incident Based Reporting System (NIBRS). Requires the criminal justice data division of the state police department to report crime statistics to the governor semiannually (rather than annually, as required under current law).
Sponsors
Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Earl Harris [D] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Public Law 15 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third sponsor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus and Doriot |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Representative Harris added as coauthor |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Ober |