IN HB1189 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Use of firefighting foam containing PFAS. Prohibits the use of Class B firefighting foam containing an intentionally added PFAS chemical: (1) for training purposes; and (2) for testing purposes, unless the testing facility has implemented appropriate measures to prevent releases of the firefighting foam to the environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of firefighting foam containing PFAS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 22
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateSenator Niemeyer added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateSenator Crider added as sponsor
2020-02-05SenateSenator Niemeyer removed as sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseRepresentatives Frye, Pressel, Forestal added as coauthors
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Mayfield

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1189/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/2/0/082081ba/HB1189.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/4/f/e34f259b/HB1189.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/a/d/c9ad36f0/HB1189.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/8/7/d08718ad/HB1189.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/9/6/dc96018d/HB1189.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/1/6/e716b2ae/HB1189.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/b/a/74ba44f0/HB1189.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/e/7/04e7d801/HB1189.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/e/2/ece2a0ba/HB1189.91_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/3/7/de37321d/HB1189.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/9/a/f09ac9ad/HB1189.225_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback