IN HB1204 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education matters. Requires that the February count of a school corporation's average daily membership (ADM) must be increased by the number of students who, during the students' expected graduation year: (1) were enrolled in the school corporation on the September ADM count day; (2) completed graduation requirements before the February ADM count day; and (3) were not enrolled in the school corporation on the February ADM count day. Removes the cap on the amount of career and technical education enrollment grants that may be distributed per state fiscal year. Requires, not later than November 1, 2020, the department of education (department) to establish standards concerning the following: (1) The minimum amount of time that a student of a virtual charter school must participate in educational activities provided by the virtual charter school each semester of the school year. (2) Requirements that a student of a virtual charter school participate in the statewide assessment or an alternate assessment, as applicable. Provides that, if a student of a virtual charter school fails, in a semester, to meet the standards, the student must be withdrawn from enrollment in the virtual charter school and may not reenroll or enroll in another virtual charter school. Requires, beginning January 1, 2021, the department to reduce state tuition support distribution to a virtual charter school if students of the virtual charter school fail to meet the standards.
Title
Education matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #7 (DeLaney) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #7 (DeLaney) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Mishler |
2020-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Crider, Bassler |
2020-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Amendment #7 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 125: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Amendment #6 (Beck) ruled out of order |
2020-01-29 | House | Amendment #3 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2020-01-29 | House | Appeal the ruling of the chair (Porter); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 124: yeas 61, nays 33 |
2020-01-29 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2020-01-29 | House | Appeal the ruling of the chair (Porter); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 123: yeas 62, nays 32 |
2020-01-29 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2020-01-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Representatives Cook, Thompson, Goodin added as coauthors |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |