IN HB1210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various health matters. Establishes penalties for intentionally interfering with an investigation and enforcement of a home health agency by the state department of health (department). Allows the department to use the immunization data registry to store and release nonimmunization personal health information. States that a responsible member of a family may release a deceased patient's medical records if the deceased patient does not have a surviving spouse or child or a personal representative of the estate. Allows mental health records to be disclosed without the consent of the patient for research purposes by rules of the Indiana archives and records administration and the oversight committee on public records. Allows health records to be disclosed by the Indiana archives and records administration to another provider or nonprofit research organization (current law is a nonprofit medical research organization) in connection with a scientific, statistical, or education project. Changes the title of a "certified food handler" to "certified food protection manager" (CFPM). Repeals the definition of "food handler". Requires a CFPM to provide certain documents to the food establishment and obtain a valid certificate every five years. Prohibits using the title "certified food protection manager" unless the person holds a certificate. Provides that a CFPM may be required to be present during all hours of operation if the department and food establishment agreed upon a variance concerning the requirements for the operation of the food establishment. Amends the establishments that are exempt from the certified food protection manager requirements. Establishes new penalties. Provides for the transition of an existing certified food handler to a certified food protection manager. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Various health matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] | Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 45 |
2020-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 313: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second sponsor |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-23 | House | Representatives Fleming, Barrett, Shackleford added as coauthors |
2020-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2020-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |