IN HB1211 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion matters. Provides that a person may not knowingly or intentionally perform a dismemberment abortion unless reasonable medical judgment dictates that performing the dismemberment abortion is necessary to: (1) prevent serious health risks to the mother; or (2) save the mother's life. Provides that the penalty for performing a dismemberment abortion is a Level 5 felony. Provides that certain individuals: (1) may petition for an injunction; (2) may bring an action for the recovery of damages; and (3) are entitled to attorney's fees; if a dismemberment abortion is performed. Provides anonymity safeguards in court or administrative actions for a woman on whom a dismemberment abortion was performed. Amends the definition of "abortion complication".
Title
Abortion matters. Provides that a person may not knowingly or intentionally perform a dismemberment abortion unless reasonable medical judgment dictates that performing the dismemberment abortion is necessary to: (1) prevent serious health risks to the mother; or (2) save the mother's life. Provides that the penalty for performing a dismemberment abortion is a Level 5 felony. Provides that certain individuals: (1) may petition for an injunction; (2) may bring an action for the recovery of damages; and (3) are entitled to attorney's fees; if a dismemberment abortion is performed. Provides anonymity safeguards in court or administrative actions for a woman on whom a dismemberment abortion was performed. Amends the definition of "abortion complication".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Public Law 93 |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senator Young M added as cosponsor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as cosponsor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 374: yeas 38, nays 10 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senators Buck and Tomes added as cosponsors |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as cosponsor |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as third sponsor |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second sponsor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senator Messmer removed as second sponsor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Messmer |
2019-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 71, nays 25 |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Representatives Smaltz and Lindauer added as coauthors |
2019-01-10 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Public Policy |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Stutzman |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Mayfield |