IN HB1225 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Safe schools. Provides that school corporations, charter schools, and accredited nonpublic schools with the sheriff for the county in which the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school is located, may apply for a grant from the Indiana secured school fund to provide for the initial set up costs for an active event warning system. Requires guidelines published by the department of homeland security to include information about implementing: (1) universal electronic access to school property for law enforcement in all schools within each county; and (2) access to closed circuit cameras from a central location to be used in an emergency situation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe schools. Provides that school corporations, charter schools, and accredited nonpublic schools with the sheriff for the county in which the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school is located, may apply for a grant from the Indiana secured school fund to provide for the initial set up costs for an active event warning system. Requires guidelines published by the department of homeland security to include information about implementing: (1) universal electronic access to school property for law enforcement in all schools within each county; and (2) access to closed circuit cameras from a central location to be used in an emergency situation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Amendment #1 (Pfaff) failed (Y: 32 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePublic Law 50
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 324: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-21SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateSenator Houchin added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Head, Charbonneau and Tallian
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseAmendment #1 (Pfaff) failed; Roll Call 83: yeas 32, nays 64
2019-02-04HouseAmendment #2 (Porter) motion withdrawn
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRepresentative Gutwein added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representatives McNamara and Moseley
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Steuerwald

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1225/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/d/7/49d7e677/HB1225.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/1/4/1614a092/HB1225.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/d/1/6ad1d544/HB1225.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/6/3/da63dd7e/HB1225.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/1/b/f01be852/HB1225.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/5/7/3c578516/HB1225.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/0/e/990ed386/HB1225.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/3/e/953e98ac/HB1225.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/5/4/9054a7ac/HB1225.83.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/4/6/44465e77/HB1225.103.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/8/8/a588b533/HB1225.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/d/a/37da328c/HB1225.324.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback