IN HB1236 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Electric bicycles. Defines the term "electric bicycle" as a bicycle equipped with: (1) operable pedals; and (2) an electric motor with a power output not greater than 750 watts. Provides that an electric bicycle is not a motor vehicle. Provides that the operator of an electric bicycle is: (1) subject to all of the duties; and (2) entitled to all of the rights and privileges; of a bicycle operator. Provides that an electric bicycle shall be regulated as a bicycle. Provides certain exceptions. Exempts the operator of an electric bicycle from motor vehicle statutes concerning: (1) driver's licenses; and (2) financial responsibility. Exempts electric bicycles from motor vehicle statutes concerning: (1) certificates of title; (2) registration; and (3) off-road vehicles. Requires manufacturers and distributors of electric bicycles to affix and prominently display a label with the following information on each electric bicycle: (1) The class level of the electric bicycle. (2) The top assisted speed of the electric bicycle. (3) The total power output of the electric bicycle's electric motor. Requires all electric bicycles to comply with certain requirements adopted by the United States Consumer Product Safety Commission. Requires all electric bicycles to be equipped with an electric motor that disengages or ceases to function when the operator: (1) stops pedaling; or (2) applies brakes. Specifies where electric bicycles may be operated. Allows a local authority or state agency with jurisdiction over a trail, bicycle path, or multipurpose path to regulate the use of electric bicycles on a trail, bicycle path, or multipurpose path subject to the local authority's or state agency's jurisdiction. Prohibits a person less than 15 years of age from operating certain electric bicycles. Allows a person less than 15 years of age to ride as a passenger on certain electric bicycles. Requires a properly fitted and fastened helmet capable of meeting certain safety standards to be worn by certain individuals when operating or riding on certain electric bicycles. Requires the operator of a motor vehicle to provide at least 3 feet of clearance when passing or overtaking an electric bicycle in certain instances. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric bicycles. Defines the term "electric bicycle" as a bicycle equipped with: (1) operable pedals; and (2) an electric motor with a power output not greater than 750 watts. Provides that an electric bicycle is not a motor vehicle. Provides that the operator of an electric bicycle is: (1) subject to all of the duties; and (2) entitled to all of the rights and privileges; of a bicycle operator. Provides that an electric bicycle shall be regulated as a bicycle. Provides certain exceptions. Exempts the operator of an electric bicycle from motor vehicle statutes concerning: (1) driver's licenses; and (2) financial responsibility. Exempts electric bicycles from motor vehicle statutes concerning: (1) certificates of title; (2) registration; and (3) off-road vehicles. Requires manufacturers and distributors of electric bicycles to affix and prominently display a label with the following information on each electric bicycle: (1) The class level of the electric bicycle. (2) The top assisted speed of the electric bicycle. (3) The total power output of the electric bicycle's electric motor. Requires all electric bicycles to comply with certain requirements adopted by the United States Consumer Product Safety Commission. Requires all electric bicycles to be equipped with an electric motor that disengages or ceases to function when the operator: (1) stops pedaling; or (2) applies brakes. Specifies where electric bicycles may be operated. Allows a local authority or state agency with jurisdiction over a trail, bicycle path, or multipurpose path to regulate the use of electric bicycles on a trail, bicycle path, or multipurpose path subject to the local authority's or state agency's jurisdiction. Prohibits a person less than 15 years of age from operating certain electric bicycles. Allows a person less than 15 years of age to ride as a passenger on certain electric bicycles. Requires a properly fitted and fastened helmet capable of meeting certain safety standards to be worn by certain individuals when operating or riding on certain electric bicycles. Requires the operator of a motor vehicle to provide at least 3 feet of clearance when passing or overtaking an electric bicycle in certain instances. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 206
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 461: yeas 92, nays 1
2019-04-09HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-18SenateSenator Sandlin added as second sponsor
2019-03-14SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Heaton added as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Macer added as coauthor
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1236/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/b/2/41b274dc/HB1236.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/4/4/ff446a49/HB1236.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/b/4/98b461db/HB1236.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/7/d/837dfed3/HB1236.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/0/c/ad0c4c3b/HB1236.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/a/8/3ca8746e/HB1236.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/5/2/df525a94/HB1236.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/e/4/a2e4de36/HB1236.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/1/b/941bbcd5/HB1236.104.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/a/0/9ba015bb/HB1236.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/f/5/30f575a6/HB1236.288.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/d/5/6cd50196/HB1236.461.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback