IN HB1237 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Subscription auto sales. Extends the subscription program prohibition to May 1, 2020. Provides that effective July 1, 2013, a document preparation fee in excess of $200 is an unfair practice. Specifies certain disclosure requirements concerning document preparation fees. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subscription auto sales. Extends the subscription program prohibition to May 1, 2020. Provides that effective July 1, 2013, a document preparation fee in excess of $200 is an unfair practice. Specifies certain disclosure requirements concerning document preparation fees. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 245
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 473: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-10HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 354: yeas 40, nays 6
2019-03-28SenateAmendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-11SenateSenator Houchin added as cosponsor
2019-03-07SenateSenator Freeman added as sponsor
2019-03-07SenateSenator Zay removed as sponsor
2019-03-07SenateSenator Freeman removed as second sponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Zay and Freeman
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1237/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/e/d/54edfdab/HB1237.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/4/4/24446124/HB1237.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/0/3/4f0381bd/HB1237.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/e/0/19e0381b/HB1237.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/8/3/8a83e2ea/HB1237.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/8/0/ed8025b2/HB1237.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/b/d/9abd268e/HB1237.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/f/3/1bf33151/HB1237.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/1/2/2a1220cb/HB1237.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/c/2/a6c260d8/HB1237.217.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/c/3/2cc38907/HB1237.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/9/9/1b99afc8/HB1237.354.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/e/6/7de67631/HB1237.473.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback