IN HB1246 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Automotive dealer services. Defines: (1) "used motor vehicle"; (2) "used motor vehicle dealer"; and (3) "new motor vehicle dealer". Amends the following definitions: (1) "Automotive salvage recycler". (2) "Manufacturer". (3) "Motor vehicle". (4) "Dealer". (5) "Dealer owner". (6) "Transfer dealer". Repeals the definition of "record". Makes conforming changes to include references to "used motor vehicle dealer" and "new motor vehicle dealer" throughout IC 9-32. Provides that the secretary of state may extend: (1) dealer and dealer designee license plate expiration dates; and (2) dealer license expiration dates; in the event of a natural disaster or other emergency. Amends provisions concerning: (1) dealer license plate restrictions; (2) interim dealer or manufacturer license plates; (3) records; (4) offsite sales permits; (5) records of sale; (6) business records; (7) background checks; and (8) notifications of dealer owners and dealer managers. Repeals provisions about evidence of liability coverage. Removes the requirement that an application for a dealer license be signed by a dealer owner or dealer manager. Provides that the requirement to send in a franchise agreement for new motor vehicles or watercraft does not apply to manufactured homes. Specifies that a motor vehicle display is not an offsite sale. Provides that, after receiving a request from a person subject to an order issued by the secretary of state, the secretary of state must issue an order within 15 days of setting a hearing date. Establishes registration requirements for transport operators through the secretary of state. (Current law provides that transport operators register with the bureau of motor vehicles.) Provides that an out-of-state dealer licensed in a state other than Indiana and approved by the BMV may perform a vehicle inspection for purposes of issuing a certificate of title. Provides that an application for a certificate of title submitted only to remove a satisfied lien is not required to be accompanied by the previously issued certificate of title if the application is accompanied with certain documents. Provides that a security agreement is perfected when: (1) the record of the lien is electronically received by the BMV; or (2) the application for certificate of title is submitted to the BMV; as applicable. Provides that certain sections related to mobile credentials have an effective date of July 1, 2020. Provides that, except in certain instances, the secretary of state may only perform an audit or inspection when the secretary has provided at least three days notice to the dealer. Provides that a person may not knowingly or intentionally manufacture, import, install, reinstall, distribute, sell, or offer for sale a component intended to replace a supplemental restraint system component in a motor vehicle if the component: (1) is a counterfeit supplemental restraint system component; (2) is a nonfunctional airbag; or (3) does not comply with certain federal motor vehicle safety standards. Provides that a person may not knowingly or intentionally sell, lease, trade, or transfer a motor vehicle to an Indiana resident in which is installed, as part of the motor vehicle's supplemental restraint system a: (1) counterfeit supplemental restraint system component; (2) nonfunctional airbag; or (3) component that does not comply with certain federal motor vehicle safety standards. Delays until July 1, 2021, the effective date of certain automotive salvage recycler provisions from HEA 1482-2019 (P.L.284-2019).
Title
Automotive dealer services.
Sponsors
Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] |
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 120 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 335: yeas 77, nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 44, nays 6 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second sponsor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Representatives Frye, Pryor, Pressel added as coauthors |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2020-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Sullivan |