IN HB1270 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Horse racing matters. Provides that the minimum salary per diem for a member of the Indiana horse racing commission equals the maximum per diem amount that an employee of the executive branch of the federal government receives. Changes the appointment process for members of breed development advisory committees and the process to appoint new members. Changes the distribution of funds to promote horses and horse racing. Authorizes advance deposit wagers on horse racing. Provides that each permit holder shall pay to the horse racing commission as an advance deposit wagering fee an amount equal to 20% of the net source
Title
Horse racing matters. Provides that the minimum salary per diem for a member of the Indiana horse racing commission equals the maximum per diem amount that an employee of the executive branch of the federal government receives. Changes the appointment process for members of breed development advisory committees and the process to appoint new members. Changes the distribution of funds to promote horses and horse racing. Authorizes advance deposit wagers on horse racing. Provides that each permit holder shall pay to the horse racing commission as an advance deposit wagering fee an amount equal to 20% of the net source
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. William Friend [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] |
Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 517: yeas 71, nays 21 |
2015-04-22 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 442: yeas 38, nays 12 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second sponsor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Senator Kenley added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 81, nays 15 |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-05 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-14 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Lehe and Friend |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |