IN HB1288 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local office campaign finance reports. Provides that a county election board may provide for electronic filing of campaign finance reports by local candidates and committees. Provides that if a county election board provides for electronic filing of campaign finance reports, the county election board may not require any candidate or committee to file campaign finance reports electronically.
Title
Local office campaign finance reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 24 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 46, nays 2 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker and Tallian |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | House | Representative Morrison added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2020-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Moseley |