IN HB1305 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Graduation rate calculation. Provides that a student who withdraws from school after completing grade 10 may not be included in a school's graduation rate if the student's parent submits to the school the following statements while the student is enrolled in grade 8: (1) A statement from the parent affirming that the parent has a sincerely held religious belief against the taking of a photograph and that the student will be withdrawing from school after completing grade 10 in order to complete a career pathway certification or due to the parent's deeply held religious belief. (2) A statement from a member of the clergy of the religious organization of which the parent is a member regarding the prohibition of photography of members of the religious organization. Requires at least one parent of the student to provide proof that the parent has been issued a photo exempt driver's license or identification card.
Title
Graduation rate calculation.
Sponsors
Rep. Christy Stutzman [R] | Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 125 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 42, nays 6 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Doriot and Rogers |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 97, nays 1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative Lindauer added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Stutzman |