IN HB1306 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Full faith and credit for tribal court orders. Requires that, under certain circumstances, a court of record in Indiana shall give full faith and credit to judgments and orders of a tribal court affiliated with the Pokagon Band of Potawatomi.
Title
Full faith and credit for tribal court orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Koch, Ford Jon, Niezgodski |
2020-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | House | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative DeLaney |