IN HB1317 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 209
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 209
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health matters. Provides that a pharmacy or pharmacist has a right to provide individuals with information concerning the individual's cost share for a prescription drug. States that a pharmacy or pharmacist cannot be proscribed by a third party administrator, a health insurer, or a health maintenance organization from discussing the information or from selling to the individual a more affordable alternative. Prohibits a copayment for a drug under the state employee health plan, an accident and sickness insurance policy, or a health maintenance organization contract from exceeding the amount payable to the pharmacy for the drug under an agreement with
Title
Health matters. Provides that a pharmacy or pharmacist has a right to provide individuals with information concerning the individual's cost share for a prescription drug. States that a pharmacy or pharmacist cannot be proscribed by a third party administrator, a health insurer, or a health maintenance organization from discussing the information or from selling to the individual a more affordable alternative. Prohibits a copayment for a drug under the state employee health plan, an accident and sickness insurance policy, or a health maintenance organization contract from exceeding the amount payable to the pharmacy for the drug under an agreement with
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | House | Public Law 209 |
2018-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 394: yeas 36, nays 13 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 375: yeas 95, nays 3 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Stoops, Grooms and Bohacek |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Becker and Breaux |
2018-03-08 | House | House advisors appointed: Carbaugh, Davisson, Kirchhofer, Ziemke and Shackleford |
2018-03-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Clere and Brown C |
2018-03-08 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 36, nays 12 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Stoops |
2018-02-05 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Charbonneau and Grooms |
2018-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-30 | House | Representatives Brown, C., Davisson, Ziemke added as coauthors |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |