IN HB1317 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health care advance directive. Allows an individual to make a health care advance directive that gives instructions or expresses preferences or desires concerning any aspect of the individual's health care or health information and to designate a health care representative to make health care decisions and receive health information for the individual. Consolidates definitions of "life prolonging procedures". Requires the state department of health to prepare a sample advance directive. Provides that the appointment of a representative or attorney in fact to consent to health care that was legally executed before January 1, 2023, is valid as executed. Adds cross-references. Makes conforming changes. Makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care advance directive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2020-02-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-31HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Barrett added as coauthor
2020-01-30HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Koch
2020-01-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #1 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as coauthor
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Kirchhofer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback