IN HB1323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Theft. Provides that a person commits the offense of theft if the person knowingly or intentionally exerts unauthorized control over property and then uses the Internet to sell, deliver, or distribute the property to another person acting as an enterprise engaged in racketeering activity.
Title
Theft. Provides that a person commits the offense of theft if the person knowingly or intentionally exerts unauthorized control over property and then uses the Internet to sell, deliver, or distribute the property to another person acting as an enterprise engaged in racketeering activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bohacek |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Schaibley |
2019-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Negele |