IN HB1326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community mental health centers. Provides that: (1) licensed clinical social workers; (2) licensed mental health counselors; (3) licensed marriage and family therapists; and (4) licensed clinical addiction counselors; who have at least two years of experience in addiction treatment or hold an addiction credential are eligible supervisors for addiction based intensive outpatient treatments under Medicaid. Defines a community mental health center as a governmental unit for purposes of the required nonfederal share of medical assistance payments under Medicaid. Provides that a provider in an intensive outpatient treatment program is not required to be a licensed addictive counselor or clinical addiction counselor if specified conditions are met. Specifies that a recovery audit does not require documentation at the time of service for services provided in certain instances. Allows a supervising provider in a community mental health center to review documentation concerning: (1) a plan of treatment; or (2) specific treatment methods; not later than 30 days from the date of service. Sets forth requirements to demonstrate active treatment in developing a plan of treatment. Requires the division to provide best practice recommendations and to work with community mental health centers in a collaborative manner. Provides that documentation that is developed as part of an incident or death audit is confidential. Allows the division of mental health and addiction to grant a waiver of staffing requirements for community mental health center applicants. Provides that a licensed prescriber with prescriptive authority shall be counted when determining whether a community mental health center applicant meets certain staffing requirements for community mental health center certification. Requires a licensed clinical addiction counselor to be counted for certain staffing requirements of community mental health centers. Requires the division to develop a comprehensive appeals process under the mental health and addiction forensic treatment program not later than January 1, 2021. Provides advanced practice nurses with all of the supervisory rights and responsibilities of: (1) licensed physicians; and (2) health service provider in psychology (HSPP) psychologists; in certain instances if specified requirements are met.
Title
Community mental health centers.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 127 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 358: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Becker and Mrvan |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Breaux |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Lindauer, Vermilion, Porter and Shackleford |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Fleming |
2020-03-04 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 312: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second sponsor |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2020-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Representative Fleming added as coauthor |
2020-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |