IN HB1343 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 252
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 252
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Libraries. Provides that, in the case of a public library outside Marion County, the fiscal body of a city, town, or county that established the public library, the governing body of which is not comprised of a majority of officials who are elected to serve on the governing body, may adopt a resolution to require the public library to submit its proposed budget and property tax levy to the city, town, or county fiscal body for binding review and approval in the same manner that is required under current law if the public library's cash on hand plus its expected revenues is greater than 150% of the public library's proposed budget. (These amounts exclude gifts, bequests, and philanthropic funds and debt funds.) Provides that the fiscal body of the city, town, or county may not reduce the public library's proposed operating budget or tax levy in a budget year by more than 10% of the public library's operating levy.
Title
Libraries. Provides that, in the case of a public library outside Marion County, the fiscal body of a city, town, or county that established the public library, the governing body of which is not comprised of a majority of officials who are elected to serve on the governing body, may adopt a resolution to require the public library to submit its proposed budget and property tax levy to the city, town, or county fiscal body for binding review and approval in the same manner that is required under current law if the public library's cash on hand plus its expected revenues is greater than 150% of the public library's proposed budget. (These amounts exclude gifts, bequests, and philanthropic funds and debt funds.) Provides that the fiscal body of the city, town, or county may not reduce the public library's proposed operating budget or tax levy in a budget year by more than 10% of the public library's operating levy.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | House | Public Law 252 |
2019-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 652: yeas 57, nays 39 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 619: yeas 29, nays 20 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Representative Frye R added as conferee |
2019-04-24 | House | Representative Chyung removed as conferee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senator Buck added as conferee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senator Lanane removed as conferee |
2019-04-17 | House | House advisors appointed: Zent, May, Abbott, Moed and Pryor |
2019-04-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Leonard and Chyung |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Tomes, Taylor G and Bohacek |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Zay and Lanane |
2019-04-16 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 443: yeas 34, nays 14 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second sponsor |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Zay |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 63, nays 33 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment #3 (Leonard) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Sullivan |
2019-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard |