IN HB1346 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Jail overcrowding. Repeals all provisions concerning the county jail overcrowding task force. Adds additional members to the justice reinvestment advisory council ("advisory council"), including members of the Indiana evidence based decision making initiative (which is a partnership between state and local criminal justice stakeholders). Specifies the purpose and certain duties of the advisory council, including: (1) to conduct a state level review and evaluation of jail overcrowding to identify a range of possible solutions; and (2) to develop incarceration alternatives and recidivism reduction programs at the county and community level by promoting the development of the incorporation of evidence based decision making into decisions concerning jail overcrowding. Provides that the advisory council may make a recommendation to the county sheriffs concerning strategies to address jail overcrowding and implementing evidence based practices for reducing recidivism for individuals in county jails. Requires the criminal justice institute to coordinate with state and local criminal justice agencies for the collection and transfer of data from sheriffs concerning jail: (1) populations; and (2) statistics; for the purpose of providing jail data to the management performance hub.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jail overcrowding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 48
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 309: yeas 93, nays 0
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenator Young M added as second sponsor
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 45, nays 0
2020-02-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Koch
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 99, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseRepresentatives Steuerwald, DeLaney, Hatfield added as coauthors
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1346/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/f/1/b7f10ac4/HB1346.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/2/0/87207d07/HB1346.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/a/f/25afefb2/HB1346.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/3/1/9331503d/HB1346.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/0/a/d50a5a42/HB1346.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/4/5/e8452285/HB1346.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/9/b/229b3b1d/HB1346.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/a/a/e4aa4d49/HB1346.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/a/c/59ac25c2/HB1346.110_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/3/8/5b38e685/HB1346.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/f/e/06fe6e33/HB1346.248_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/b/4/d2b453ce/HB1346.309_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback