IN HB1348 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate advisors appointed: Busch and Lanane
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate advisors appointed: Busch and Lanane
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State and local administration. Repeals the following boards and commissions: (1) Public highway private enterprise review board. (2) Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development commission. Repeals the following advisory councils and advisory boards: (1) Interstate rail passenger advisory council. (2) Orange County development advisory board. Repeals the high speed rail development fund (fund) and requires the budget agency to transfer any unencumbered money in the fund to the state general fund. Provides that money in the industrial service fund may be used to provide money for the Midwest Interstate Passenger Rail Compact. Repeals language concerning responsibilities of the circuit court clerk (clerk) with respect to: (1) the clerk's receipt of the registry of certain alcohol permits; (2) notification to the clerk of a hearing regarding the fitness of an applicant seeking certain alcohol permits; and (3) the clerk's issuance of hunting, trapping, and fishing licenses. Provides that a newspaper may not charge an indigent person a fee for publishing a legal notice that is greater than the governmental rate. Exempts certain work done by the employees of a conservancy district established for the purpose of water or sewage treatment from certain requirements that apply to public works contracts. Makes conforming changes.
Title
State and local administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Sen. Justin Busch [R] |
Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Busch and Lanane |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Melton |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Cherry, Lehman, Harris and Jackson |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Gutwein and Austin |
2020-03-03 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as second sponsor |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Busch |
2020-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Representatives Lehman and Engleman added as coauthors |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction |
2020-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Gutwein |