IN HB1358 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use of unmanned aerial vehicles. Requires a law enforcement officer to obtain a warrant to use an unmanned aerial vehicle (UAV) over private property or to conduct a search of private property, unless: (1) the owner of the property consents; or (2) a warrant would not be required for a search not using a UAV.
Title
Use of unmanned aerial vehicles. Requires a law enforcement officer to obtain a warrant to use an unmanned aerial vehicle (UAV) over private property or to conduct a search of private property, unless: (1) the owner of the property consents; or (2) a warrant would not be required for a search not using a UAV.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Beau Baird [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Public Law 136 |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 524: yeas 61, nays 25 |
2019-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 356: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Zay |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 79, nays 16 |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Carbaugh, Baird and Moed |
2019-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Morris |