IN HB1383 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various election law matters. Eliminates the small precinct committee. Requires, not later than July 1, 2018, that the election commission adopt an order consolidating precincts in Lake County having fewer than 600 active voters, if the consolidation will realize savings for the county and not impose unreasonable obstacles on the ability of the voters of the county to vote at the polls. Provides that, if the commission does not adopt an order, the secretary of state, not later than August 1, 2018, and not later than July 1 each year immediately following a presidential election, shall issue the order. Requires
Title
Various election law matters. Eliminates the small precinct committee. Requires, not later than July 1, 2018, that the election commission adopt an order consolidating precincts in Lake County having fewer than 600 active voters, if the consolidation will realize savings for the county and not impose unreasonable obstacles on the ability of the voters of the county to vote at the polls. Provides that, if the commission does not adopt an order, the secretary of state, not later than August 1, 2018, and not later than July 1 each year immediately following a presidential election, shall issue the order. Requires
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 59 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Kersey) failed (Y: 26 N: 58 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Kersey) failed (Y: 26 N: 58 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | House | Public Law 210 |
2018-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 360: yeas 59, nays 21 |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 331: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as cosponsor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph removed as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer |
2018-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Representative Richardson added as coauthor |
2018-01-31 | House | Representative Hatfield added as coauthor |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #4 (Kersey) failed; Roll Call 123: yeas 26, nays 58 |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Slager |