IN HB1426 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education matters. Urges the legislative council during the 2018 through 2020 interims to assign to the education interim study committee the task of studying issues relating to a school corporation's ability to provide adequate career counseling to students. Requires the state board of education (state board) to establish one standard Indiana diploma for individuals who successfully complete high school graduation requirements. (Current law establishes four different diplomas.) Provides that each Indiana diploma must include one of the following designations: (1) General designation. (2) Core 40 designation. (3) Core 40 with academic honors designation. (4) Core 40 with technical honors designation.
Title
Education matters. Urges the legislative council during the 2018 through 2020 interims to assign to the education interim study committee the task of studying issues relating to a school corporation's ability to provide adequate career counseling to students. Requires the state board of education (state board) to establish one standard Indiana diploma for individuals who successfully complete high school graduation requirements. (Current law establishes four different diplomas.) Provides that each Indiana diploma must include one of the following designations: (1) General designation. (2) Core 40 designation. (3) Core 40 with academic honors designation. (4) Core 40 with technical honors designation.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 21 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #3 (DeVon) prevailed (Y: 73 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 21 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #3 (DeVon) prevailed (Y: 73 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Public Law 192 |
2018-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 415: yeas 71, nays 25 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 421: yeas 44, nays 4 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz, Mrvan, Zay and Spartz |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Kruse and Melton |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Cook, Clere and Smith V |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Austin |
2018-03-07 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 336: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Raatz |
2018-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 84, nays 5 |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 143: yeas 21, nays 62 |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendment #3 (DeVon) prevailed; Roll Call 142: yeas 73, nays 12 |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendment #4 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendment #5 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-29 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Cook added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Behning |