IN HCR0020 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the study of constructing an inn at Potato Creek State Park.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the study of constructing an inn at Potato Creek State Park.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Deal [D] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bohacek |
2020-01-28 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-01-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative Pressel |
2020-01-28 | House | Authored by Representative Deal |