IN HCR0034 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana State Trooper Roy E. Jones.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana State Trooper Roy E. Jones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative Austin |
2019-03-18 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |