IN HCR0036 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the Indiana State Bar Association Leadership Development Academy.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the Indiana State Bar Association Leadership Development Academy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Freeman |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Representative DeLaney |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/house/concurrent/36/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/a/6/5fa65fc0/HC0036.01.INTR.pdf |