IN HCR0038 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the United States Forest Service to establish an off-road vehicles (ORVs) trail system.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the United States Forest Service to establish an off-road vehicles (ORVs) trail system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Cosponsors: Senators Lanane and Messmer |
2020-02-17 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Alting, Boots, Koch |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Austin, Bacon, Bartels, Beck, Ellington, Goodin, Gutwein, Klinker, Lehe, Lehman, May, McNamara, Negele, Saunders, Speedy, VanNatter, Wolkins |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/house/concurrent/38/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/f/b/36fba488/HC0038.01.INTR.pdf |