IN SB0001 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State board of education governance. Adds a statement of legislative intent regarding the roles of the general assembly, the state board of education (state board), and the department of education (department) relating to education. Makes changes, beginning June 1, 2015, to the composition of the state board. Provides that the state board may hire staff and administrative support. Provides that, after December 31, 2016, the state board shall elect a chairperson annually from the members of the state board. Provides that the state board shall, after June 30, 2015, elect a vice chairperson annually from the members of the state
Title
State board of education governance. Adds a statement of legislative intent regarding the roles of the general assembly, the state board of education (state board), and the department of education (department) relating to education. Makes changes, beginning June 1, 2015, to the composition of the state board. Provides that the state board may hire staff and administrative support. Provides that, after December 31, 2016, the state board shall elect a chairperson annually from the members of the state board. Provides that the state board shall, after June 30, 2015, elect a vice chairperson annually from the members of the state
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Judson McMillin [R] |
Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #8 (Smith V) failed (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #6 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #9 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #7 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #8 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #14 (Broden) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #9 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #10 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #8 (Smith V) failed (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #6 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - House - Amendment #9 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #7 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #8 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #14 (Broden) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #9 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #10 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 592: yeas 60, nays 38 |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Cook removed as advisor |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Smith V removed as conferee |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Cook added as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senator Lanane removed as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 559: yeas 31, nays 17 |
2015-04-20 | House | House Advisors appointed: Behning, Cook, McNamara, Austin, Errington and Moed |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees appointed: McMillin and Smith V |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Kenley, Breaux, Rogers, Kruse and Yoder |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Holdman and Lanane |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | Representative Wesco added as cosponsor |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 436: yeas 55, nays 42 |
2015-04-13 | House | Amendment #8 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 408: yeas 36, nays 57 |
2015-04-13 | House | Amendment #6 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 407: yeas 27, nays 67 |
2015-04-13 | House | Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 406: yeas 27, nays 67 |
2015-04-13 | House | Amendment #9 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 405: yeas 27, nays 67 |
2015-04-13 | House | Amendment #14 (Smith M) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 33, nays 17 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 35(c); technical corrections |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 144: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 143: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 142: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Broden) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Broden) failed; Roll Call 141: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 140: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 139: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |