IN SB0001 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Administrative law study commission. Establishes the 12 member administrative law study commission (commission) to study issues concerning whether administrative law judges and environmental law judges should be replaced by an administrative court that conducts administrative hearings and other duties currently conducted by administrative law judges and environmental law judges. Requires the commission to submit a final report to the legislative council concerning the commission's findings and recommendations before November 1, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative law study commission. Establishes the 12 member administrative law study commission (commission) to study issues concerning whether administrative law judges and environmental law judges should be replaced by an administrative court that conducts administrative hearings and other duties currently conducted by administrative law judges and environmental law judges. Requires the commission to submit a final report to the legislative council concerning the commission's findings and recommendations before November 1, 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21SenatePublic Law 11
2016-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-23HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2016-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 96, nays 0
2016-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-15HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-01SenateSenator Delph added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateCosponsor: Representative Koch
2016-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2016-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-01-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-01-28SenateSenator Head added as second author
2016-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/1/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/9/4/2c946ac9/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/5/e/7f5eadf6/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/f/4/6df4c5a5/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/e/b/6deb773d/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/3/1/6f31405e/SB0001.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/5/e/c25e331e/SB0001.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/0/3/c503e188/SB0001.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/d/d/52dda3bd/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/8/1/6081b8f4/SB0001.70.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/7/2/69724c23/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/c/f/8ecf1324/SB0001.199.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback