IN SB0001 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

E-liquids. Limits the applicability of e-liquids statutes for a manufacturer of a closed system vapor product. Removes date restrictions in the e-liquids statutes. Removes the following requirements for an initial e-liquids manufacturing permit: (1) Construction and operation plans for manufacturing facilities. (2) Service agreements. (3) Security firm specifications. (4) Projected e-liquid production outputs. (5) Consent for the alcohol and tobacco commission (ATC) to conduct inspections. (6) Any other information required by the ATC. Requires a manufacturer to verify that it will comply with manufacturing practices and ingredient listing requirements required by federal law. Removes the following renewal application requirements: (1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

E-liquids. Limits the applicability of e-liquids statutes for a manufacturer of a closed system vapor product. Removes date restrictions in the e-liquids statutes. Removes the following requirements for an initial e-liquids manufacturing permit: (1) Construction and operation plans for manufacturing facilities. (2) Service agreements. (3) Security firm specifications. (4) Projected e-liquid production outputs. (5) Consent for the alcohol and tobacco commission (ATC) to conduct inspections. (6) Any other information required by the ATC. Requires a manufacturer to verify that it will comply with manufacturing practices and ingredient listing requirements required by federal law. Removes the following renewal application requirements: (1)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenatePublic Law 206
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 520: yeas 45, nays 5
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 540: yeas 83, nays 14
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Smaltz, Mahan, Austin and Brown C
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehman and GiaQuinta
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Alting, Taylor G and Holdman
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Randolph Lonnie M
2017-04-10SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-10SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 402: yeas 91, nays 4
2017-04-04HouseAmendment #1 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-13HouseRepresentatives GiaQuinta and Austin added as cosponsors
2017-03-13HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehman
2017-02-28SenateCosponsors: Representatives Steuerwald, Smaltz and Mahan
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 49, nays 1
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-07SenateSenators Bassler and Ford added as coauthors
2017-01-30SenateSenator Mishler added as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2017-01-24SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2017-01-24SenateSenator Boots added as coauthor
2017-01-24SenateSenators Holdman, Merritt, Doriot, Bohacek, Smith, Walker added as coauthors
2017-01-24SenateSenators Becker, Charbonneau, Kruse, Raatz, Young, M., Zay, Messmer added as coauthors
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-17SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/1/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/a/4/cea4c15d/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/3/5/2b35a032/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/b/6/3bb69337/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/3/e/f83ebdd8/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/2/8/40286918/SB0001.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/2/3/b3233bed/SB0001.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/7/3/f273c0ce/SB0001.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/9/f/349f33c4/SB0001.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/2/8/e628c2bb/SB0001.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/8/b/e08b01fa/SB0001.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/a/a/abaad40e/SB0001.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/f/9/10f9f36d/SB0001.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/c/8/5ac850d0/SB0001.212.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/2/d/3d2d8f06/SB0001.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/c/5/45c5cf17/SB0001.402.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/1/2/db12177b/SB0001.520.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/6/a/016a5671/SB0001.540.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback