IN SB0001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tobacco and vaping smoking age. Prohibits a person who is less than 21 years of age from buying or possessing: (1) tobacco; (2) e-liquids; or (3) electronic cigarettes. Makes conforming changes regarding enforcement provisions, sales certificates, prohibition of delivery sales, and notices posted at retail establishments and at vending machines. Provides that a retail establishment that sells an e-liquid to a person less than 21 years of age is subject to a civil judgment for an infraction. Doubles the civil judgment for an infraction for: (1) a retail establishment that sells or distributes tobacco, an e-liquid, or an electronic cigarette to a person less than 21 years of age; and (2) certain retail establishments that allow an underage person to enter their establishment. Modifies the time frame for when retail establishments may receive enhanced penalties for repeat e-liquid and tobacco products violations. Requires a merchant who mails or ships cigarettes as part of a delivery sale to use a shipping service that requires a customer to present identification if they appear to be less than 30 years of age. Provides that a tobacco sales certificate (certificate) may only be issued to a person who has not had an interest in a certificate revoked by the commission for a business location within one year. Makes it a Class C misdemeanor if a tobacco and vaping business operates within 1,000 feet of a public or private elementary or secondary school. Provides that a retail establishment in which tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, and e-liquids account for at least 85% of the retail establishment's gross sales: (1) may not allow a person who is less than 21 years of age to enter the retail establishment; and (2) is not subject to a statute prohibiting sales of tobacco or electronic cigarettes through a self-service display. Makes it a Class B infraction for a person to knowingly sell tobacco, an e-liquid, or an electronic cigarette that contains vitamin E acetate. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco and vaping smoking age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenatePublic Law 49
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 385: yeas 77, nays 16
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 380: yeas 37, nays 11
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-09HouseHouse advisors appointed: Bacon, Davisson, Zent, Fleming and Hatfield
2020-03-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Shackleford
2020-03-09SenateSenate advisors appointed: Ruckelshaus and Randolph Lonnie M
2020-03-09SenateSenate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Stoops
2020-03-09SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-09SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 78, nays 16
2020-03-02HouseAmendment #1 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-27SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-23SenateCosponsor: Representative Huston
2020-01-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
2020-01-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 38, nays 9
2020-01-21SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateAmendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as third author
2020-01-14SenateSenator Bray added as second author
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/1/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/9/5/399587b9/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/1/d/3f1d58c4/SB0001.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/3/9/56392d43/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/d/f/b2df31f6/SB0001.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/9/7/f9979ce2/SB0001.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/a/4/60a40ed0/SB0001.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/3/8/2138655b/SB0001.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/a/7/a1a76c0f/SB0001.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/3/b/3e3bbddf/SB0001.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/d/e/00decfeb/SB0001.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/6/1/da611859/SB0001.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/5/c/375c1665/SB0001.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/b/e/f0bef3ac/SB0001.38_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/5/6/ca561571/SB0001.03.ENGS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/0/f/7b0ffbc2/SB0001.264_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/0/5/b905df8e/SB0001.380_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/1/7/8017a29c/SB0001.385_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback