IN SB0002 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Public Law 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School accountability. Provides that a school's or school corporation's category or designation of school or school corporation performance assigned by the state board of education for the 2018-2019 school year may not be lower than the school's or school corporation's category or designation of school or school corporation performance for the 2017-2018 school year. Provides that a school's or school corporation's category or designation of school or school corporation performance assigned by the state board of education for the 2019-2020 school year is the higher of the school's or school corporation's: (1) category or designation of school or school corporation performance assigned for the 2018-2019 school year; or (2) category or designation of school or school corporation performance for the 2019-2020 school year. Provides that consequences for school improvement do not apply for the 2018-2019 or 2019-2020 school years. Provides that ILEARN program test scores or a school's category or designation of school improvement for the 2018-2019 or 2019-2020 school year may not be used by a school corporation as part of an annual performance evaluation of a particular certificated employee unless the use of the ILEARN program test scores or a school's category or designation of school improvement would improve the particular certificated employee's annual performance rating.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Melton) failed (Y: 8 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12SenatePublic Law 2
2020-02-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-02-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-02-04SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
2020-02-04HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 90, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseRepresentatives Carbaugh, Kirchhofer, Smith, V. added as cosponsors
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-27HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-13SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-13SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2020-01-13SenateHouse sponsor: Representative DeVon
2020-01-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 8: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-01-09SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2020-01-09SenateAmendment #1 (Melton) failed; Roll Call 6: yeas 8, nays 37
2020-01-09SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-07SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2020-01-07SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2020-01-07SenateSenator Bray added as second author
2020-01-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Raatz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/2/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/e/8/cbe8dff3/SB0002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/8/a/9a8af8eb/SB0002.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/f/9/68f9d1eb/SB0002.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/0/3/9d03e3f5/SB0002.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/c/3/f6c30f57/SB0002.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/c/0/dec0a00c/SB0002.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/c/f/ddcf027c/SB0002.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/6/0/3e60c22d/SB0002.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/7/6/047646a1/SB0002.6_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/2/3/e72321d2/SB0002.8_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/2/a/e42a3593/SB0002.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/5/b/d45b59a6/SB0002.151_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback