IN SB0012 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Resident tuition rate for active duty personnel. Makes the following changes to provisions concerning resident tuition rate eligibility for active duty armed forces personnel and dependents of active duty armed forces personnel: (1) Defines "dependent". (2) Amends the definition of "qualified course". (3) Provides that spouses of active duty armed forces personnel are eligible for the resident tuition rate. (4) Provides that spouses and dependents of active duty armed forces personnel are eligible, from the date that the state educational institution accepts the spouse or dependent for enrollment, for the resident tuition rate if the spouse or dependent enrolls in the state educational institution within a certain amount of time. (5) Provides that a dependent or spouse of a person who serves on active duty in the armed forces is eligible for the resident tuition rate for the duration of the spouse's or dependent's continuous enrollment at a state educational institution regardless of whether the person serving on active duty continues, after the spouse or dependent is accepted for enrollment in the state educational institution, to satisfy certain resident rate tuition eligibility criteria.
Title
Resident tuition rate for active duty personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as third author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |