IN SB0014 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Review of criminal penalties during the interim. Provides that the interim study committee on corrections and criminal code (committee) may review a proposed bill containing a criminal provision (criminal bill) during the interim if: (1) a new or increased criminal penalty in the bill is a Level 5 felony or greater; and (2) the legislative council does not assign the bill to another interim committee. Establishes standards for the review of a criminal bill, and specifies that review of a criminal bill by the committee is not a prerequisite for the bill to receive a hearing and does not bar the filing of a bill. Provides that the chair of a standing committee to which a criminal bill has been assigned should consider whether, based on certain enumerated factors, a bill reviewed by the committee should receive precedence in being set for a hearing. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on corrections and criminal code.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Review of criminal penalties during the interim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Tallian
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senators Young M, Bray, Lanane

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback