IN SB0016 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile delinquents and firearms. Prohibits a person who has been adjudicated a delinquent child for committing an act while armed with a firearm that would be a serious violent felony if committed by an adult (serious delinquent) from possessing a firearm unless the person is at least: (1) 26 years of age, in the case of less serious acts; or (2) 28 years of age, in the case of more serious acts. Makes possession of a firearm by a serious delinquent a Level 6 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Requires a juvenile court to transmit certain findings to the office of judicial administration for transmission to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS) upon a finding of delinquency for an act that would be a serious violent felony if committed by an adult.
Title
Juvenile delinquents and firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senators Ruckelshaus and Ford J.D. added as coauthors |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Alting added as third author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus removed as third author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Alting removed as second author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Negele |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pressel |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 11: yeas 43, nays 6 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as third author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bohacek |