IN SB0019 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic technology for ophthalmic prescriptions. Removes the restriction on the prescribing of ophthalmic devices through telemedicine and sets conditions on when a provider may, through telemedicine, prescribe medical devices. Establishes conditions that must be met before a prescriber may issue a prescription for an ophthalmic device through telemedicine. Prohibits making changes and substitutions to a prescription for contact lenses or prescription eye glasses unless under the direction of the prescriber. States that a prescriber is not liable for any damage or injury to an individual resulting from the packaging, manufacturing, or dispensing of the contact lenses or prescription eye glasses unless the prescriber is also the seller. Prohibits the optometry board from establishing restrictive standards concerning the practice of ocular telemedicine or ocular telehealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic technology for ophthalmic prescriptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-02-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Vermilion A and Barrett
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #2 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-06SenateSenator Messmer added as second author
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/19/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/d/f/3adf0ca5/SB0019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/7/b/807bbb13/SB0019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/6/c/7f6c3b64/SB0019.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/7/2/8d7277ae/SB0019.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/0/3/cc03f246/SB0019.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/8/2/3c82f9d3/SB0019.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/7/c/c67c23ba/SB0019.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/5/c/665ce65c/SB0019.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/b/9/00b99389/SB0019.134_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/7/d/fe7dde9b/SB0019.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/0/0/87006f1d/SB0019.184_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback