IN SB0020 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Plan commissions. Allows a county agricultural extension educator (educator) serving on a county plan commission or an area plan commission who is not a resident of the county to continue to serve on the county plan commission or area plan commission until: (1) October 1, 2020; or (2) the date set forth in a county legislative body ordinance that is after October 1, 2020, and not later than October 1, 2021. Provides that an educator who is not a resident of the county shall serve the county plan commission or area plan commission in a nonvoting advisory capacity. Provides that the county surveyor's designee must be a resident of the county to serve on the county plan commission or area plan commission. Requires a person appointed to a plan commission to fill a vacancy or to serve as an alternate member to meet the same requirements as the member the person is appointed to replace.
Title
Plan commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Rep. Thomas Saunders [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 53 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 323: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Goodin) motion withdrawn |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Saunders |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senators Rogers and Kruse added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gaskill |