IN SB0025 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health disability review panels. Establishes mental health disability review panels (review panel) for evaluation of members of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (1977 fund) who have been determined to have an impairment for mental illness. Includes mental illness in the description of "occupational diseases" for purposes of determining whether a 1977 fund member has an impairment. Makes the final determination of an impairment for a mental illness provisional for two years: (1) beginning July 1, 2020, for a final determination made after December 31, 2012, and before July 1, 2020; or (2) from the date of the final determination, for a final determination made after June 30, 2020. Requires that, during that time, the 1977 fund member participate in a mental health treatment plan, at the employer's cost, and at the end of the two year period, requires the review panel to evaluate the 1977 fund member to determine if the 1977 fund member: (1) is medically able to return to duty; or (2) may continue for another two year provisional disability period. Requires that, at the end of the second provisional period, the review panel evaluate the 1977 fund member to determine if the 1977 fund member: (1) is medically able to return to duty; or (2) has a permanent impairment. Provides that the evaluations conducted by the mental health disability review panels are confidential. Provides that the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system may suspend a 1977 fund member's disability benefits if the member fails to comply with reasonable requests for information by the mental health disability review panel. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on pension management oversight.)
Title
Mental health disability review panels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 54 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 324: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Representative Moseley added as cosponsor |
2020-02-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Smaltz and Steuerwald |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senators Doriot and Niezgodski added as coauthors |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |