IN SB0033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Worker's compensation. Allows an officer of a corporation who is also an owner of any interest in the corporation to elect not to be an employee of the corporation under worker's compensation. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee for the 2015 interim period the topic of worker's compensation reimbursement to all providers of worker's compensation related claims outside of hospitals, including the study of a common baseline of the providers' Medicare reimbursement rate plus a reimbursement above the Medicare level, seeking fair reimbursement. Removes outdated language.
Title
Worker's compensation. Allows an officer of a corporation who is also an owner of any interest in the corporation to elect not to be an employee of the corporation under worker's compensation. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee for the 2015 interim period the topic of worker's compensation reimbursement to all providers of worker's compensation related claims outside of hospitals, including the study of a common baseline of the providers' Medicare reimbursement rate plus a reimbursement above the Medicare level, seeking fair reimbursement. Removes outdated language.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] |
Rep. Charles Moseley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Law 225 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 544: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Dissent withdrawn |
2015-04-21 | House | Representative Torr added as advisor |
2015-04-20 | House | House Advisors appointed: Ober, Leonard, Bartlett and Niezgodski |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees appointed: Lehman and Moseley |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Walker, Arnold J, Niemeyer and Glick |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Boots and Tallian |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Representative Moseley added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 373: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Representative Ober added as cosponsor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Representative Lehman added as sponsor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |