IN SB0047 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expungement issues. Defines "protection order records" and requires companies that provide background checks to periodically review their records and remove records relating to expunged protection orders (in the same manner as expunged convictions are removed). Permits a person to expunge protection order records in connection with the denial of an ex parte petition for a protection order. Provides that if a court reduces a Class D or Level 6 felony to a misdemeanor, the five-year waiting period for expungement begins on the date of the felony conviction and not on the date the felony was converted to a misdemeanor. Provides that, if a person whose records have been expunged seeks employment with a law enforcement agency or a probation or community corrections department, the law enforcement agency or the probation or community corrections department may: (1) inquire about the person's expunged records; and (2) refuse to employ the person. Specifies the procedure to expunge records of a collateral action entered in a different county than the county which issued the expungement order.
Title
Expungement issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 55 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 386: yeas 89, nays 4 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 381: yeas 41, nays 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Young M added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Tallian removed as conferee |
2020-03-09 | House | House advisors appointed: McNamara, May, Beck and Hatcher |
2020-03-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Young J and Pierce |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Koch and Taylor G |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Tallian |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 88, nays 5 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Boots added as coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as third author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |