IN SB0054 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Railroad crossings. Subject to available funding, requires the department of transportation to construct, in locations where practical and necessary, lanes and signs at railroad crossings on state highways.
Title
Railroad crossings.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Speedy, Miller, Jordan |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |