IN SB0061 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

EMS personnel licensure interstate compact. Implements the emergency medical services personnel licensure interstate compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMS personnel licensure interstate compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenatePublic Law 3
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-02-19HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2020-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 186: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-02-17HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2020-02-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13HouseRepresentative Kirchhofer added as cosponsor
2020-02-13HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation
2020-01-22SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-21SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-21SenateCosponsor: Representative Vermilion A
2020-01-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bacon
2020-01-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-01-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-09SenateSenator Garten added as third author
2020-01-09SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2020-01-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/61/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/6/2/e0623e89/SB0061.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/e/a/a5ea1f9d/SB0061.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/7/c/e67c2649/SB0061.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/7/7/f8777af5/SB0061.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/5/cd25c3ac/SB0061.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/f/b/0afb2272/SB0061.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/a/2/bca259c5/SB0061.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/f/f/bcff82df/SB0061.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/a/9/3ea9fc7f/SB0061.24_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/7/9/7679d28a/SB0061.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/d/8/7dd8b592/SB0061.186_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback