IN SB0062 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Psychotropic medication in foster care study committee topic. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the topic of the supervision and distribution of psychotropic medication to children that are in foster care.
Title
Psychotropic medication in foster care study committee topic.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Davisson, Engleman, Fleming |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |