IN SB0063 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Senator Stoops added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Senator Stoops added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State forest commission and management plan. Establishes the Indiana state forest commission. Specifies the membership of the state forest commission. Requires the state forest commission to meet in 2020, 2021, and 2022 and to issue a written report establishing a plan for the management of the state forests for the 100 year period beginning in 2023. Provides that the state forest commission's plan must contain certain recommendations and must embody certain principles. Requires the state forest commission to set forth in its report the subjects discussed and issues raised concerning which the general assembly may choose to pass legislation. Requires the natural resources commission to adopt rules incorporating the state forest commission's determination about the percentage of state forest land falling within each of the three "priority use" categories. Requires the natural resources commission, every seven years, to conduct a review of the implementation of the state forest commission's plan and to adopt rules to revise the plan, as appropriate.
Title
State forest commission and management plan.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senators Ruckelshaus, Bassler, Walker |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/63/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/b/e/e8be5cfa/SB0063.01.INTR.pdf |