IN SB0064 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal background check. Includes public libraries in the definition of "qualified entities" for purposes of criminal background checks. Requires qualified entities to conduct a background check under certain circumstances. Provides that a public library: (1) is not required to conduct a background check on employees or volunteers whose scope of work does not include contact with children; and (2) is required to perform a background check on a person who conducts a performance, presentation, or workshop for children less than 14 years of age. Specifies that a public library is not required to conduct a background check on an individual if the library or another library has conducted a background check within the previous year and certain other conditions are met.
Title
Criminal background check. Includes public libraries in the definition of "qualified entities" for purposes of criminal background checks. Requires qualified entities to conduct a background check under certain circumstances. Provides that a public library: (1) is not required to conduct a background check on employees or volunteers whose scope of work does not include contact with children; and (2) is required to perform a background check on a person who conducts a performance, presentation, or workshop for children less than 14 years of age. Specifies that a public library is not required to conduct a background check on an individual if the library or another library has conducted a background check within the previous year and certain other conditions are met.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Rep. Matt Hostettler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Bacon and Hostettler |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wesco |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 38, nays 11 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senators Leising and Raatz added as coauthors |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as third author |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |