IN SB0072 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Hyperbaric oxygen treatment pilot program. Removes the requirement that rules adopted by the state department of health, in consultation with the department of veterans' affairs, include patient health improvement as a condition for approval of payment for treatment under the hyperbaric oxygen treatment pilot program (pilot program). Removes the requirement that the state department of health receive pretreatment and posttreatment evaluation documentation as a condition for approval of payment for hyperbaric oxygen treatment. Requires that rules adopted by the state department of health concerning the pilot program not include criteria requiring patient health improvement as a condition for approval of payment for treatment.
Title
Hyperbaric oxygen treatment pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senators Freeman, Alting, Rogers added as coauthors |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senators Crider, Boots, Ruckelshaus, Young M added as coauthors |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Garten added as third author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bacon |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau removed as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |